EP0448722 - Apparatus for controlling the dose of irradiation of a product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/40] | ILLUMINANCE CONTROLLING DEVICE | ||
[1996/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1997 [1997/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd. No. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8531 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd. No. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSHIDA, Mamoru Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | 02 /
OIZUMI, Masaru Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | 03 /
ICHIZAWA, Yoshiyuki Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead & Co. 19 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 90914757.1 | 09.10.1990 | [1991/40] | WO1990JP01304 | Priority number, date | JP19890263406 | 09.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26340689 | [1991/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9105353 | Date: | 18.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0448722 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0448722 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.04.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G21K5/00, G21K5/10, C08J7/00, G21K5/04, G21K1/04 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
G21K5/10 (EP,US);
G21K5/00 (KR);
B29C71/04 (EP,US);
G21K1/10 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0877 (EP,US);
B29L2007/008 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7158 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/40] | G21K5/00, G21K5/10, C08J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/40] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Übervachung der Bestrahlungsdosis eines Produktes | [1996/16] | English: | Apparatus for controlling the dose of irradiation of a product | [1996/16] | French: | Installation de contrôle de la dose d'irradiation d'un produit | [1996/16] |
Former [1991/40] | BELEUCHTUNGSÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [1991/40] | ILLUMINANCE CONTROLLING DEVICE | ||
Former [1991/40] | DISPOSITIF REGULATEUR D'ECLAIREMENT | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1991 | Translation filed | 01.07.1991 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1991 | Search fee paid | 01.07.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 18.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 02.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2004050 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) | International search | [A]JPS573920B ; | [X]JPS61220844 (TOSHIBA ELECTRIC EQUIP) |