EP0450088 - BIAXIALLY ORIENTED POLYETHYLENE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOHJIN CO. Ltd. 1-1, Shinbashi 1 chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states KOHJIN CO. Ltd. 1-1, Shinbashi 1 chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISOZAKI, Hideo 4-9, Koukoku-machi Yatsushiro-shi Kumamoto 866 / JP | 02 /
HIRATA, Makoto 1221, Oomuta Sentyo-machi Yatsushiro-gun Kumamoto 866 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Masumi 971-7, Minoridai Matsudo-shi Tiba 271 / JP | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 90914781.1 | 09.10.1990 | [1991/41] | WO1990JP01307 | Priority number, date | JP19890261973 | 09.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26197389 | [1991/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9105004 | Date: | 18.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0450088 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0450088 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.04.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, B32B27/32, B29C55/12 | [1991/41] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (KR);
B29C55/005 (EP);
B29C55/023 (EP);
B29C55/28 (EP);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B37/085 (US);
B32B37/153 (US);
C08J5/18 (EP);
C08K5/101 (EP);
C08L23/0815 (EP);
B29K2023/0625 (EP);
B32B2038/0028 (US);
B32B2307/54 (US);
B32B2323/046 (US);
C08J2323/06 (EP);
C08L2205/02 (EP);
C08L2205/03 (EP);
C08L23/0869 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/06 (EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/22 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/41] | Title | German: | BIAXIAL ORIENTIERTE POLYETHYLENFOLIE | [1991/41] | English: | BIAXIALLY ORIENTED POLYETHYLENE FILM | [1991/41] | French: | FILM DE POLYETHYLENE A ORIENTATION BIAXIALE | [1991/41] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.1991 | Translation filed | 06.06.1991 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.1991 | Search fee paid | 06.06.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 13.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.05.1996 | CH | 08.05.1996 | ES | 08.05.1996 | LI | 08.05.1996 | NL | 08.05.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 08.05.1996 | |
CH | 08.05.1996 | ||
ES | 08.05.1996 | ||
LI | 08.05.1996 | ||
Former [1997/21] | BE | 08.05.1996 | |
CH | 08.05.1996 | ||
LI | 08.05.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | CH | 08.05.1996 | |
LI | 08.05.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS62295927 (KURIINRATSUPU KK, et al); | [A]JPS6310639 (KOHJIN CO); | [A]JPS6414018 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPS6422548 (OKURA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH01131210 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND) | Examination | EP0240705 | EP0374783 |