EP0491857 - POLYMERIC WAVEGUIDE DEVICE FOR PHASE MATCHED SECOND HARMONIC GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION 86 Morris Avenue Summit, NJ 07901 / US | [1992/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHANARIAN, Garo 141 Cornell Avenue Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922 / US | 02 /
NORWOOD, Robert 3939 Rutland Road Bethlehem, PA 18017 / US | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1992/27] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 90914862.9 | 05.09.1990 | [1992/27] | WO1990US05009 | Priority number, date | US19890405501 | 11.09.1989 Original published format: US 405501 | [1992/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9103752 | Date: | 21.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491857 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/26 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
G02F1/3775 (EP,US);
G02F1/0147 (EP,US);
G02F1/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/27] | Title | German: | POLYMERWELLENLEITERVORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG DER ZWEITEN HARMONISCHEN MIT PHASENANPASSUNG | [1992/27] | English: | POLYMERIC WAVEGUIDE DEVICE FOR PHASE MATCHED SECOND HARMONIC GENERATION | [1992/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GUIDE D'ONDES POLYMERE DE GENERATION DE SECONDE HARMONIQUE ACCORDEE EN PHASE | [1992/27] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.1992 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.1992 | Search fee paid | 07.03.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 07.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/27] | 01.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/38] | 28.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP1023234 | [A] - PROCEEDINGS SPIE vol. 1147, 10 August 1989, SAN-DIEGO,CA pages 129 - 133; G,KHANARIAN: 'NONLINEAR OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF ORGANIC MATERIALS II' PHASE MATCHED SECOND HARMONIC GENERATION IN A PERIODIC POLYMER WAVEGUIDE | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 29, no. 9, November 1976, NEW YORK US pages 572 - 574; N UESUGI: 'efficient second harmonic generation ...' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 203 (P-870)15 May 1989 & JP-A-1 023 234 ( CANON ) 25 January 1989, & JP1023234 A 19890125 | International search | [A]US3688124 (FREUND ISAAC, et al); | [A]US3719411 (MIDWINTER J); | [A]US3830555 (WARNER J); | [A]US3842289 (YARIV A, et al); | [A]US3995936 (HEPNER GEORGES, et al); | [A]US4054362 (BAUES PETER); | [A]US4767169 (TENG CHIA-CHI [US], et al); | [A]US4792208 (ULMAN ABRAHAM [US], et al); | [AP]US4865406 (KHANARIAN GARO [US], et al) |