EP0447526 - CONSTRUCTION WITH COVER ACTING AS SHELTER AND BUILT FROM DISMONTABLE MODULAR ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHARONDIERE, Ghislaine 1 rue Jules-Ferry, Bonson 42160 Andrézieux-Bouthéon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | For all designated states CHARONDIERE, Ghislaine 1 rue Jules-Ferry, Bonson F-42160 Andrézieux-Bouthéon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/39] | Representative(s) | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville B.P. 203 42005 St. Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras, 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville, BP 203 F-42005 St. Etienne Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90914929.6 | 04.10.1990 | [1991/39] | WO1990FR00705 | Priority number, date | FR19890013368 | 06.10.1989 Original published format: FR 8913368 | [1991/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9105124 | Date: | 18.04.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0447526 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E04H15/58 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
E04H1/1272 (EP);
E04H15/58 (EP);
E04B2001/2406 (EP);
E04B2001/2472 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/39] | Title | German: | EINEN UNTERSTAND BILDENDE KONSTRUKTION MIT ABDECKUNG AUS ZERLEGBAREN MODULELEMENTEN | [1991/39] | English: | CONSTRUCTION WITH COVER ACTING AS SHELTER AND BUILT FROM DISMONTABLE MODULAR ELEMENTS | [1991/39] | French: | CONSTRUCTION AVEC COUVERTURE FAISANT OFFICE D'ABRIS A PARTIR D'ELEMENTS MODULAIRES DEMONTABLES | [1991/39] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 04.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/15] | 12.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.1993 | 31.10.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE8712679U [ ]; | DE8906210U [ ]; | US4730739 [ ]; | US3971182 [ ]; | DE3213717 [ ]; | GB2164674 [ ]; | FR2576048 [ ]; | US40047342 [ ] |