EP0448725 - CHARACTER DATA COMPRESSION METHOD AND CHARACTER MODIFICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAKAJIMA ALL PRECISION CO., LTD. 1480, Oaza-Kamigomyo Sakaki-Machi Hanishina-gun Nagano-Ken / JP | [1996/02] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states NAKAJIMA ALL PRECISION KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1480, Oaza Kamigomyo Sakaki-machi Hanishina-gun Nagano 389-06 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAISHI, Masayuki 3812-1-1-A, Kamiyamada Kamiyamada-machi Sarashina-gun Nagano 389-08 / JP | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Roger, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1991/40] | Application number, filing date | 90915173.0 | 17.10.1990 | [1991/40] | WO1990JP01337 | Priority number, date | JP19890269322 | 17.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26932289 | JP19890285437 | 01.11.1989 Original published format: JP 28543789 | [1991/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9105664 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0448725 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0448725 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/485 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
G06K15/02 (EP);
G06K2215/0031 (EP);
G06K2215/0051 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERDICHTEN VON CHARAKTERDATEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÄNDERUNG DER CHARAKTER | [1991/40] | English: | CHARACTER DATA COMPRESSION METHOD AND CHARACTER MODIFICATION METHOD | [1991/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMPRESSION DE DONNEES DE CARACTERES ET PROCEDE DE MODIFICATION DE CARACTERES | [1991/40] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1991 | Translation filed | 17.06.1991 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1991 | Search fee paid | 17.06.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 15.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS61284457 ; | [Y]JPS5631024B ; | [Y]JPS6227789 ; | [Y]JPH01184154 ; | [Y]JPS62278052 ; | [P]JPH01275159 |