EP0450103 - MEDICAL TREATMENT APPARATUS USING OZONE GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA MIHAMA SEISAKUSHO 11417 Miyagawa Chino-shi Nagano-ken / JP | For all designated states YUGEN KAISHA AOI SHOJI 1017, Kamimachi, Shimabara-shi Nagasaki 855 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA MIHAMA SEISAKUSHO 11417 Miyagawa Chino-shi Nagano-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states YUGEN KAISHA AOI SHOJI 1017, Kamimachi, Shimabara-shi Nagasaki 855 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMA, Mamoru Kabushiki Kaisha Mihama Seisakusho 11417, Miyagawa Chino-shi Nagano 391 / JP | 02 /
MITSUYOSHI, Matao 11-11, Iwamotocho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | 03 /
HASHIMOTO, Takahiro Yugen Kaisha Aoi Shoji 1017, Kamimachi Shimabara-shi Nagasaki 855 / JP | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1991/41] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 90915832.1 | 24.10.1990 | [1991/41] | WO1990JP01369 | Priority number, date | JP19890277942 | 25.10.1989 Original published format: JP 27794289 | JP19890277943 | 25.10.1989 Original published format: JP 27794389 | [1991/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9106275 | Date: | 16.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0450103 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0450103 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.05.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61H33/14 | [1991/41] | CPC: |
A61H33/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61M35/30 (EP,US);
A61H2033/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/43] |
Former [1991/41] | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE | Title | German: | OZONGAS VERWENDENDE MEDIZINISCHE BEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1991/41] | English: | MEDICAL TREATMENT APPARATUS USING OZONE GAS | [1991/41] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT MEDICAL UTILISANT DE L'OZONE GAZEUX | [1991/41] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.1991 | Translation filed | 17.07.1991 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1991 | Search fee paid | 17.07.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE491523 (HEINRICH GEFFCKEN DR, et al); | [X]US4376437 (SUNDHEIM BENSON R [US], et al); | [A]WO8301388 (NIELSEN FRESE); | [A]US3946733 (HAN JIN SUK) | International search | [X]JPS62144659 (SAPPORO BREWERIES, et al); | [P]JPH0237634U |