EP0500674 - A METHOD OF PRODUCING CELLULOSIC PULP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STFI Box 5604 114 86 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | For all designated states STFI Box 5604 S-114 86 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGSTRAND, Per Skogsbovägen 2 S-616 33 Aby / SE | 02 /
HAMMAR, Lars-Ake Värmlandsvägen 402 S-123 48 Farsta / SE | 03 /
SJÖGREN, Birger Arstavägen 858 S-136 90 Handen / SE | 04 /
SVENSSON, Börje De Gamlas väg 13 S-122 35 Enskede / SE | 05 /
HTUN, Myat Vinstavägen 60 S-162 24 Vällingby / SE | [1992/44] |
Former [1992/36] | 01 /
ENGSTRAND, Per Björnkärrsvägen 96 S-183 46 Täby / SE | ||
02 /
HAMMAR, Lars-Ake Värmlandsvägen 402 S-123 48 Farsta / SE | |||
03 /
SJÖGREN, Birger Arstavägen 858 S-136 90 Handen / SE | |||
04 /
SVENSSON, Börje De Gamlas väg 13 S-122 35 Enskede / SE | |||
05 /
HTUN, Myat Vinstavägen 60 S-162 24 Vällingby / SE | Representative(s) | Onn, Thorsten, et al Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB STOCKHOLMS PATENTBYRA Box 23101 S-104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 90916835.3 | 06.11.1990 | [1992/36] | WO1990SE00721 | Priority number, date | SE19890003710 | 06.11.1989 Original published format: SE 8903710 | [1992/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9106700 | Date: | 16.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0500674 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D21B1/02 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
D21C1/00 (EP);
D21B1/021 (EP);
D21B1/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZELLULOSEBREI | [1992/36] | English: | A METHOD OF PRODUCING CELLULOSIC PULP | [1992/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PATE DE CELLULOSE | [1992/36] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1992 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 01.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/49] | 01.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]SE416481 | [X] - DERWENT'S ABSTRACT, No. 88-19 849/03, SU 1 313 931, publ. week 8803. |