EP0497886 - ASSAY COMPRISING MIXED IMMUNOGLOBULINS FOR DETECTION OF RHEUMATOID FACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/33] | MIXED IMMUNOGLOBULINS FOR DETECTION OF RHEUMATOID FACTORS | ||
[1996/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1400 Ueberroth Building 405 Hilgard Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90024-1406 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 1400 Ueberroth Building 405 Hilgard Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90024-1406 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISBART, Richard 9621 Lockford Street Los Angeles, CA 93335 / US | [1992/33] | Representative(s) | Warcoin, Jacques Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | Warcoin, Jacques Cabinet Régimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90916889.0 | 03.10.1990 | [1992/33] | WO1990US05624 | Priority number, date | US19890425474 | 23.10.1989 Original published format: US 425474 | US19900517246 | 01.05.1990 Original published format: US 517246 | [1992/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9105873 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0497886 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0497886 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/564, C12Q1/00, G01N33/53 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
G01N33/581 (EP);
G01N33/564 (EP);
G01N2800/102 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/33] | C12Q1/00, G01N33/53, G01N33/564 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, DAS GEMISCHTE IMMUNOGLOBULINE VERWENDET, ZUM NACHWEIS VON RHEUMATISCHEN FAKTOREN | [1996/12] | English: | ASSAY COMPRISING MIXED IMMUNOGLOBULINS FOR DETECTION OF RHEUMATOID FACTORS | [1996/12] | French: | ESSAIS QUI UTILISE IMMUNOGLOBULINES MELANGEES POUR DETECTER DE FACTEURS RHUMATOIDES | [1996/12] |
Former [1992/33] | GEMISCHTE IMMUNOGLOBULINE ZUM NACHWEIS VON RHEUMATISCHEN FAKTOREN | ||
Former [1992/33] | MIXED IMMUNOGLOBULINS FOR DETECTION OF RHEUMATOID FACTORS | ||
Former [1992/33] | IMMUNOGLOBULINES MELANGEES DE DETECTION DE FACTEURS RHUMATOiDES | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1992 | Search fee paid | 18.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 09.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0323785 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS vol. 108, 1988, pages 205 - 208; A.LARSSON ET AL.: 'Chicken antibodies: a tool to avoid false positives results by rheumatoid factor in latex fixation tests' | [A] - JOURNAL OF LAB. CLINICAL MED. vol. 97, no. 6, 1981, pages 842 - 853; R.M.POPE ET AL-: 'IgG rheumatoid factor: analysis of varoius species of IgG for detection by radioimmunoassay.' | [A] - AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY vol. 74, no. 6, 1980, pages 776 - 784; S.P.HALBERT ET AL.: 'A Quantitative Enzyme Immunoassay for IgM Rheumatoid Factor Using Human Immunoglobulin G as Substrate.' | International search | [Y]US3594466 (GUFFROY RENE AUGUSTE DENIS); | [Y]US4347311 (SCHMITZ HANS H); | [Y]US4361647 (REMINGTON JACK S, et al); | [Y]US4434227 (UNGER JOHN T [US]) | [Y] - B. DAVIS et al, "MICROBIOLOGY" published 1980 by HARPER ANDROW (Philadelphia), see pages 354-359, especially page 355, figure 17-18. |