EP0448706 - HIGH-SPEED POWER ENCODE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNISYS CORPORATION Township Line and Union Meeting Roads P.O. Box 500 Blue Bell, PA 19424-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states UNISYS CORPORATION Township Line and Union Meeting Roads P.O. Box 500 Blue Bell, PA 19424-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRAGON, Thomas 21864 Bedford Drive Northville, MI 48167 / US | 02 /
HYLAN, John 2330 Fairway Birmingham, MI 48009 / US | 03 /
REYNOLDS, Robert, J. 870 Murray Hill Milford, MI 48042 / US | 04 /
McCARTHY, Paul 18655 Wakenden Redford, MI 48240 / US | 05 /
MERCHANT, Paul 19462 Northridge Dr. Apt. B Northville, MI 48167 / US | 06 /
BERKOBEN, Kenneth, R. 46317 Westbriar Ct. Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90916946.8 | 04.10.1990 | [1991/40] | WO1990US05674 | Priority number, date | US19890419050 | 10.10.1989 Original published format: US 419050 | US19890419343 | 10.10.1989 Original published format: US 419343 | US19890419357 | 10.10.1989 Original published format: US 419357 | US19890419364 | 10.10.1989 Original published format: US 419364 | US19890419423 | 10.10.1989 Original published format: US 419423 | US19890419571 | 10.10.1989 Original published format: US 419571 | [1991/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9106069 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | [1991/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0448706 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06K13/06, G06K13/07, B65H7/00, B65H7/14, B65H9/20, B65H23/038, B65H23/02 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
B41J9/46 (EP);
B41J13/32 (EP);
B41J15/00 (EP);
B41J9/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/40] | Title | German: | SEHR SCHNELLES AUTOMATISIERTES KODIERMODUL | [1991/40] | English: | HIGH-SPEED POWER ENCODE MODULE | [1991/40] | French: | MODULE DE CODAGE AUTOMATISE TRES RAPIDE | [1991/40] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 20.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/45] | 12.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP61124459 ; | [A]JP57145750 ; | US3501236 [ ]; | US3848192 [ ]; | FR2508205 [ ]; | US3815102 [ ]; | EP0317932 [ ] | [Y] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, vol. 10, no. 315 (C-529)(2371), 25 October 1986; & JP-A-61124459 (OMRON TATEISI) 12 June 1986, & JP61124459 A 19860612 | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, vol. 6, no. 249 (M-177)(1127), 8 December 1982; & JP-A-57145750 (TOKYO SHIBAURA), 8 September 1982, & JP57145750 A 19820908 |