Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0500698
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
05.08.1995 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] |
01.06.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] |
07.03.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] |
19.08.1994 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] |
28.10.1993 |
First examination report |
|
17.07.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] |
17.07.1992 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] |