EP0500698 - RECOVERY OF FLOATING LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BURT SEPARATORS LIMITED 45/47 South Street, Bishop's Stortford Hertfordshire CM23 3AG / GB | [1992/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURT, David, Alan 4 Kingsbridge Road Bishop's Stortford Hertfordshire CM23 3AG / GB | [1992/36] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90917055.7 | 06.11.1990 | [1992/36] | WO1990GB01702 | Priority number, date | GB19890024980 | 06.11.1989 Original published format: GB 8924980 | [1992/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9106711 | Date: | 16.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0500698 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500698 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E02B15/04 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
E02B15/102 (EP,US);
Y02A20/204 (EP,US);
Y10S210/923 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/36] | Title | German: | AUFSAMMELN VON SCHWIMMENDER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [1992/36] | English: | RECOVERY OF FLOATING LIQUID | [1992/36] | French: | RECUPERATION DE LIQUIDE FLOTTANT | [1992/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.10.1994 | CH | 05.10.1994 | DK | 05.10.1994 | GR | 05.10.1994 | LI | 05.10.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 05.10.1994 | |
CH | 05.10.1994 | ||
DK | 05.10.1994 | ||
LI | 05.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 05.10.1994 | |
CH | 05.10.1994 | ||
LI | 05.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/17] | CH | 05.10.1994 | |
LI | 05.10.1994 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1183067 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [Y]GB1523590 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO); | [Y]GB2041231 (BAUMARD A); | [Y]GB2156234 (UNIV MANCHESTER); | [X]EP0203057 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]) |