EP0499618 - HYDROLYSIS OF RESIN IN PULP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | For all designated states SCA WIFSTA-ÖSTRAND AB Box 123 861 00 Timra / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
For all designated states SCA WIFSTA-ÖSTRAND AB Box 123 S-861 00 Timra / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALMGREN, Kent Harmonigatan 11C S-852 44 Sundsvall / SE | 02 /
PEDERSEN, Lars, Saaby Bagsvaerdvey 69B.14 DK-2800 Lyngby / DK | 03 /
SKJOLD-JOERGENSEN, Steen Georginevej 12 DK-2970 Hoersholm / DK | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Knudsen, Sten Lottrup, et al Novo Nordisk A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Knudsen, Sten Lottrup, et al c/o Novo Nordisk A/S, Patent Department, Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 90917186.0 | 07.11.1990 | [1992/35] | WO1990DK00282 | Priority number, date | DK19890005561 | 08.11.1989 Original published format: DK 556189 | SE19900000077 | 10.01.1990 Original published format: SE 9000077 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9107542 | Date: | 30.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0499618 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0499618 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D21C9/08, D21C9/16, C12S3/08 | [1994/42] | CPC: |
D21C9/002 (EP,US);
D21B1/021 (EP,US);
D21C5/005 (EP,US);
D21C9/08 (EP,US);
D21C9/086 (EP,US);
D21C9/163 (EP,US);
D21H11/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/35] | D21C9/08, D21C9/16, D21B1/02, D21H11/02, C12S3/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/35] | Title | German: | HYDROLYSE VON HARZ IN PAPIERBREI | [1992/35] | English: | HYDROLYSIS OF RESIN IN PULP | [1992/35] | French: | HYDROLYSE DE RESINE EN PRODUCTION DE PATE DE CELLULOSE | [1992/35] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/42: Teilanmeldung 94200814.5 eingereicht am 07/11/90 | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.1992 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 28.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94200814.5 / EP0618326 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.10.1994 | DK | 19.10.1994 | GR | 19.10.1994 | LU | 30.11.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | BE | 19.10.1994 | |
DK | 19.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/30] | BE | 19.10.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]SE8405128 ; | [A]US3486969 (NILSSON THOMAS, et al); | [A]NO124193B (STAR PAPER MILL AS [NO], et al); | [XP]EP0374700 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP]) |