EP0500715 - ALUMINIUM ALLOYS SUITABLE FOR LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2000 | Opposition rejected | published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIMBACH, Peter, Karl, Ferdinand 21 Zum Hohen Brunnen D-3400 Goettingen / DE | 02 /
MARSHALL, Graeme, John 2 The Cedars Greatworth Banbury Oxon OX17 2DY / GB | 03 /
RICKS, Ricky, Arthur 1 The Green Combe Oxon OX7 2NT / GB | [1992/36] | Representative(s) | Wise, Stephen James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | Wise, Stephen James, et al c/o RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 90917211.6 | 22.11.1990 | [1992/36] | WO1990GB01804 | Priority number, date | GB19890026404 | 22.11.1989 Original published format: GB 8926404 | [1992/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9107514 | Date: | 30.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0500715 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500715 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/00, B41N1/08 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
B41N1/083 (EP,US);
C22C21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/36] | Title | German: | FÜR LITHOGRAPHIEDRUCKPLATTEN GEEIGNETE ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGEN | [1992/36] | English: | ALUMINIUM ALLOYS SUITABLE FOR LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATES | [1992/36] | French: | ALLIAGES A BASE D'ALUMINIUM POUR PLANCHES D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE | [1992/36] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 09.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.1997
06.03.1997
ADMISSIBLE VAW aluminium AG Georg-von-Boeselager-Str. 25 53117 Bonn / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Wolff, Thomas HARWARDT NEUMANN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte BrandTstrasse 10 53721 Siegburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.1997
06.03.1997
ADMISSIBLE VAW aluminium AG Georg-von-Boeselager-Str. 25 53117 Bonn / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Wolff, Thomas HARWARDT NEUMANN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte BrandTstrasse 10 53721 Siegburg / DE | 27.03.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.09.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.09.1999 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 10.10.1999 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 22.05.1996 | GR | 22.05.1996 | SE | 22.08.1996 | LU | 30.11.1996 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 22.05.1996 | |
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | SE | 22.08.1996 | Cited in | International search | DE1608198 [ ] (OLIN MATHIESON); | FR2131646 [ ] (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | DE2737232 [ ] (ALUSUISSE); | DE3406406 [ ] (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al); | US4511632 [ ] (TOMA KEN [JP], et al); | EP0211574 [ ] (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO [JP], et al); | EP0239995 [ ] (FURUKAWA ALUMINIUM [JP], et al) | Examination | - H. Westengen "Formation of Intermetallic Compounds During DC Casting of a Commercial Purity Al-Fe-Si Alloy Z". Metallkunde 1982,73,360 | - P. Skjerpe "Intermetallic Phases Formed During DC Casting of an Al-0.25 wt.%Fe-0.13wt.%Si Alloy", Met. Trans. A 1987, 18A, 189. |