EP0500726 - WATERMARKED PLASTIC SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARJO WIGGINS S.A. 117 quai du Président Roosevelt 92442 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | For all designated states ARJO WIGGINS S.A. 117 quai du Président Roosevelt F-92442 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [1992/36] | For all designated states ARJO WIGGINS S.A. 3, rue du Pont de Lodi F-75006 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALOPE, Christophe 60, rue de la Chevalerie F-60230 Chambly / FR | 02 /
BARTHEZ, Alain 13, avenue Jean-Moulin F-75014 Paris / FR | 03 /
MENEZ, Jean-Paul 18, rue d'Antony F-91370 Verrières-le-Buisson / FR | [1993/20] |
Former [1992/36] | 01 /
HALOPE, Christophe 18, rue Genevoise F-38500 Voiron / FR | ||
02 /
BARTHEZ, Alain 13, avenue Jean-Moulin F-75014 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
MENEZ, Jean-Paul 18, rue d'Antony F-91370 Verrières-le-Buisson / FR | Representative(s) | Leszczynski, André, et al Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/09] | Leszczynski, André, et al NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1994/46] | Daudens, Michèle, et al Société Arjo Wiggins S.A. 117 quai du Président Roosevelt F-92442 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [1993/16] | Portal, Gérard Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1992/36] | Daudens, Michèle Société Arjo Wiggins S.A. 117 quai du Président Roosevelt F-92442 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 90917296.7 | 13.11.1990 | [1992/36] | WO1990FR00808 | Priority number, date | FR19890014925 | 14.11.1989 Original published format: FR 8914925 | [1992/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9107285 | Date: | 30.05.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0500726 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500726 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41M3/10, B41M1/30 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
D21H21/44 (EP,US);
B41M3/10 (EP,US);
B41M5/508 (EP,US);
B42D25/333 (EP,US);
B42D25/351 (EP,US);
B42D25/369 (EP,US);
B42D25/373 (EP,US);
B42D25/382 (EP,US);
B42D25/387 (EP,US);
D21H17/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24835 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/36] | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFTRÄGER MIT WASSERZEICHEN | [1992/36] | English: | WATERMARKED PLASTIC SUPPORT | [1992/36] | French: | SUPPORT PLASTIQUE FILIGRANE | [1992/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.02.1994
02.03.1994
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.02.1994
02.03.1994
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 D-81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | 25.03.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.09.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.10.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 14.12.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.01.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/10] | Appeal following opposition | 09.10.1995 | Appeal received No. T0837/95 | 18.12.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.1993 | DK | 19.05.1993 | SE | 19.05.1993 | GR | 20.08.1993 | [2004/51] |
Former [2000/52] | AT | 19.05.1993 | |
CH | 19.05.1993 | ||
DK | 19.05.1993 | ||
LI | 19.05.1993 | ||
SE | 19.05.1993 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 19.05.1993 | |
DK | 19.05.1993 | ||
SE | 19.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 19.05.1993 | |
SE | 19.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | SE | 19.05.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4520063 (SIMON MANFRED [DE], et al); | [A]FR2353676 (WIGGINS TEAPE LTD [GB]); | [A]GB2159463 (CONTINU FORMS HOLDINGS PLC); | [A]DE2229517 (XEROX CORP) |