EP0502040 - Dental composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/37] | DENTAL AMALGAM CAPSULE | ||
[1999/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOUTHERN DENTAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED 5 Brunsdon Street Bayswater, VIC 3153 / AU | [1992/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEETHAM, Jeffery, James 5 Brunsdon Street Bayswater, VIC 3153 / AU | [1992/37] | Representative(s) | Lyons, Andrew John Marks & Clerk LLP Tower Building Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | Lyons, Andrew John ROYSTONS Tower Building Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90917297.5 | 22.11.1990 | [1992/37] | WO1990AU00566 | Priority number, date | AU19890007528 | 23.11.1989 Original published format: AU 752889 | AU19900009400 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: AU 940090 | [1992/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9107924 | Date: | 13.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502040 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502040 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 13.06.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/04, A61C5/06 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
A61C5/66 (EP,US);
A61C5/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/37] | Title | German: | Dentale Zusammensetzung | [1999/26] | English: | Dental composition | [1999/26] | French: | Capsule pour composition | [1999/26] |
Former [1992/37] | DENTALE AMALGAMKAPSEL | ||
Former [1992/37] | DENTAL AMALGAM CAPSULE | ||
Former [1992/37] | CAPSULE D'AMALGAME DENTAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.1992 | Search fee paid | 02.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 02.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.02.2000 | BE | 02.02.2000 | CH | 02.02.2000 | ES | 02.02.2000 | GR | 02.02.2000 | IT | 02.02.2000 | LI | 02.02.2000 | NL | 02.02.2000 | DK | 02.05.2000 | SE | 02.05.2000 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
ES | 02.02.2000 | ||
GR | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
NL | 02.02.2000 | ||
DK | 02.05.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
ES | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
NL | 02.02.2000 | ||
DK | 02.05.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
ES | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
NL | 02.02.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
ES | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 02.02.2000 | |
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 08.05.2000 | |
LI | 08.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4470505 (KORWIN PAUL [US], et al) | International search | [X]AU1829470B ; | [X]AU1829570B ; | [X]AU1964770B ; | [X]AU1459270B ; | [X]CH195772 (DOLL PETER [DE]); | [X]DE2060626 (DENTAIRE IVOCLAR ETS); | [X]AU3223771 (GOUPIL J J); | [X]US3739947 (BAUMANN E, et al); | [X]GB1326289 (DENTAIRE IVOCLAR ETS); | [Y]US3828434 (MOSCH W); | [X]US3831742 (KIEFER R, et al); | [Y]AU8508575 (WARDEN F, et al); | [Y]AU5709680 (WELLCOME FOUND); | [Y]US4659327 (BENNETT DOUGLAS D [US], et al); | [X]AU7263487 (DENSPLY INT INC); | [Y]WO8809645 (MUEHLBAUER ERNST [DE]); | [XP]AU3780989 (MUEHLBAUER ERNST ) |