EP0502041 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING BARK AND FOR DETERMINING THE DEGREE OF BARKING ON WOOD AND CHIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STFI Box 5604 114 86 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states STFI Box 5604 S-114 86 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Lennart Färjvägen 14 S-860 30 Sörberge / SE | 02 /
RINGSTRÖM, Leif Vitalisvägen 6 S-112 55 Stockholm / SE | [1992/37] | Representative(s) | Onn, Thorsten, et al Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB STOCKHOLMS PATENTBYRA, Zacco & Bruhn, Box 23101 S-104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 90917307.2 | 09.11.1990 | [1992/37] | WO1990SE00728 | Priority number, date | SE19890003821 | 14.11.1989 Original published format: SE 8903821 | [1992/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9107653 | Date: | 30.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502041 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502041 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0502041 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/84, G01N33/46 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/46 (EP,US);
G01N21/8986 (EP,US);
G01N33/34 (EP,US);
G01N2021/8887 (EP,US);
G01N2201/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR [1992/37] | Title | German: | METHODE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM NACHWEIS VON RINDE UND ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES RINDENANTEILS AUF HOLZ UND SPÄNEN | [1992/37] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING BARK AND FOR DETERMINING THE DEGREE OF BARKING ON WOOD AND CHIPS | [1992/37] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPRAREIL DE DETECTION D'ECORCE, ET DE DETERMINATION DU DEGRE D'ECORCAGE DE BOIS ET DE COPEAUX | [1992/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 13.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 13.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/07] | Request for further processing for: | 13.11.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 14.02.1996 | [2002/25] | Cited in | International search | [A]SE400381 (PLESSEY HANDEL INVESTMENT AG [CH]); | [A]SE404964 (SARLOS SEPPO EDVARD [FI]); | [Y]US4266675 (BARWISE ROBERT D, et al); | [A]DE3200810 (ALTIM CONTROL KY [FI]); | [Y]FI64301B (KONE OY [FI]) | [A] - DERWENT'S ABSTRACT No. 362 90 K/15, SU 933 130, publ. week 8315 VERETENNIKOV S B. | by applicant | SE400381 | SE404964 |