EP0500732 - DIAGNOSTIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING A BINUCLEAR COMPLEX, A METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND ITS USE IN MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUERBET S.A. 15, rue des Vanesses Z.A.C. Paris Nord II F-93420 Villepinte / FR | [1992/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURGOIN, Corinne 88, avenue Ledru-Rollin F-75012 Paris / FR | 02 /
DESPLANCHES, Gérard 95, rue de Sèvres F-92100 Boulogne / FR | 03 /
LECAYON, Michèle 20, résidence Les Aulnettes F-91640 Briis-sur-Forge / FR | [1992/36] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90917353.6 | 15.11.1990 | [1992/36] | WO1990FR00818 | Priority number, date | FR19890015035 | 16.11.1989 Original published format: FR 8915035 | [1992/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9107191 | Date: | 30.05.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0500732 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500732 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
A61K49/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/36] | Title | German: | EINEN BINUKLEAREN KOMPLEX ENTHALTENDE DIAGNOSTIKZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG IN MAGNETISCHER KERNRESONANZBILDERZEUGUNG | [1992/36] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING A BINUCLEAR COMPLEX, A METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND ITS USE IN MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING | [1992/36] | French: | COMPOSITION DE DIAGNOSTIC COMPRENANT UN COMPLEXE BINUCLEAIRE, SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET SON UTILISATION EN IMAGERIE PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE | [1992/36] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 22.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.10.1996 | DK | 16.10.1996 | ES | 16.10.1996 | GR | 16.10.1996 | NL | 16.10.1996 | BE | 30.11.1996 | CH | 30.11.1996 | LI | 30.11.1996 | LU | 30.11.1996 | SE | 16.01.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 16.10.1996 | |
DK | 16.10.1996 | ||
ES | 16.10.1996 | ||
GR | 16.10.1996 | ||
BE | 30.11.1996 | ||
CH | 30.11.1996 | ||
LI | 30.11.1996 | ||
LU | 30.11.1996 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 16.10.1996 | |
DK | 16.10.1996 | ||
GR | 16.10.1996 | ||
BE | 30.11.1996 | ||
CH | 30.11.1996 | ||
LI | 30.11.1996 | ||
LU | 30.11.1996 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 16.10.1996 | |
DK | 16.10.1996 | ||
BE | 30.11.1996 | ||
CH | 30.11.1996 | ||
LI | 30.11.1996 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 16.10.1996 | |
BE | 30.11.1996 | ||
CH | 30.11.1996 | ||
LI | 30.11.1996 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | AT | 16.10.1996 | |
BE | 30.11.1996 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | AT | 16.10.1996 | |
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 16.10.1996 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0071564 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [Y]FR2539996 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0133603 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]WO8702893 (UNIV TEXAS [US]); | [Y]FR2596992 (GUERBET SA [FR]); | [Y]EP0258616 (SALUTAR INC [US]); | [A]EP0263059 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [Y]WO8900052 (MALLINCKRODT INC [US]); | [AP]WO9003804 (COCKBAIN JULIAN R M [GB], et al) |