EP0502052 - A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF COOKING LIQUORS HAVING HIGH SULPHIDITY FOR SULPHATE PULP COOKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1995 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For:SE
EKA NOBEL AB S-445 01 Bohus / SE | For:DE
ES
FR
SE
AT
CHEMREC AKTIEBOLAG P.O. Box 1033 S-651 15 Karlstad / SE | [1993/13] |
Former [1993/09] | For:SE
EKA NOBEL AB S-445 01 Bohus / SE | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
AT
CHEMREC AKTIEBOLAG P.O. Box 1033 S-651 15 Karlstad / SE | |||
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states EKA NOBEL AB S-445 01 Bohus / SE | ||
For all designated states CHEMREC AKTIEBOLAG P O Box 44 S-182 11 Danderyd / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDBLOM, Mats-Olov Mansbovägen 11 S-774 00 Avesta / SE | 02 /
LINDBERG, Hans Drottningholmsvägen 5 S-112 42 Stockholm / SE | [1992/37] | Representative(s) | Perneborg, Henry T., et al UPPSALA PATENTBYRA P.O. Box 9013 750 09 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | Perneborg, Henry T., et al UPPSALA PATENTBYRA, P.O. Box 9013 S-750 09 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 90917424.5 | 21.11.1990 | [1992/37] | WO1990SE00751 | Priority number, date | SE19890003953 | 23.11.1989 Original published format: SE 8903953 | [1992/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9108337 | Date: | 13.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502052 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502052 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D21C11/04 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
D21H17/00 (EP);
D21C11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, SE [1992/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AUFSCHLUSSLÖSUNGEN MIT HOHER SULFIDITÄT FÜR DAS KOCHEN VON SULFATPULPE | [1992/37] | English: | A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF COOKING LIQUORS HAVING HIGH SULPHIDITY FOR SULPHATE PULP COOKING | [1992/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE LIQUEURS DE CUISSON DE SULFIDITE ELEVEE POUR LA CUISSON DE PATE A PAPIER AU SULFATE | [1992/37] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4098639 (NOREUS STURE ERIK OLOF, et al); | [A]US4710269 (SANTEN SVEN [SE], et al) |