EP0499624 - METHODS OF DETERMINING BACTERIA POPULATIONS ELECTROCHEMICALLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.05.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INFOMETRIX, INCORPORATED 2200 Sixth Avenue, Suite 833 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | [1992/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROHRBACK, Gilson, H. 2125 First Avenue No. 3302 Seattle, WA 92631 / US | 02 /
HOLMES, Elmond, A. 548 North Lincoln Fullerton, CA 92631 / US | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90917636.4 | 02.11.1990 | [1992/35] | WO1990US06507 | Priority number, date | US19890433607 | 07.11.1989 Original published format: US 433607 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9106670 | Date: | 16.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0499624 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.05.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/06, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/04, C12Q1/26 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
C12Q1/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/35] | C12Q1/06, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/26 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/35] | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHES BESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR BAKTERIENPOPULATIONEN | [1992/35] | English: | METHODS OF DETERMINING BACTERIA POPULATIONS ELECTROCHEMICALLY | [1992/35] | French: | PROCEDE ELECTROCHIMIQUES DE QUANTIFICATION DE POPULATIONS DE BACTERIES | [1992/35] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1992 | Search fee paid | 22.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 20.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/29] | 20.02.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - FOOD MICROBIOLOGY vol. 6, no. 3, 1989, USA pages 159 - 169 R.A. PATCHETT ET AL. 'Rapid detection of bateria by an amperometric electrode system - a comparison of some redox mediators.' | [A] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED BACTERIOLOGY vol. 66, no. 1, 1989, CAMBRIDGE UK pages 49 - 55 R.A. PATCHETT ET AL 'Investigation of a simple amperometric electrode system to rapidly quantify and detect bacteria in foods.' | International search | [Y]US4517291 ; | [Y]US4246343 ; | [Y]US4386157 | [X] - Biological Abstracts, Volume 88, No. 1, Issued 01 July 1989 (USA), R.G. KROLL, et al., "An oxygen electrode-based assay of catalase activity as a rapid method for estimating the bacterial content of foods", the Abstract No. 3556, J Appl. Bacteriol, 66(3), 209-218 (Eng). |