EP0502912 - WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.1996 [1996/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberg, Götz, Dipl.-Phys. Am Hügel 16 D-82319 Starnberg / DE | [1992/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90917643.0 | 30.11.1990 | [1992/38] | WO1990EP02060 | Priority number, date | DE19893939862 | 01.12.1989 Original published format: DE 3939862 | [1992/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9108394 | Date: | 13.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502912 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F03D3/00, F03D11/04 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
F03D13/25 (EP,US);
F03D13/20 (EP,US);
F03D13/22 (EP,US);
F03D3/005 (EP,US);
F03D80/70 (EP,US);
F03D9/25 (EP,US);
F05B2240/214 (EP,US);
Y02E10/727 (EP,US);
Y02E10/728 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/38] | Title | German: | WINDKRAFTANLAGE | [1992/38] | English: | WIND TURBINE | [1992/38] | French: | EOLIENNE | [1992/38] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/26] | 02.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/26] | Request for further processing for: | 26.08.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.09.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE3810339 [ ] (HEIDELBERG MOTOR GMBH [DE]); | FR730384 [ ]; | FR332379 [ ] (MARCELLIN BONNIER [FR]); | DE3629872 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | DE3721383 [ ] (GEIER HANS); | EP0074938 [ ] (SUNDMAN STIG) |