EP0440015 - Hydrogen-occlusion alloy electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FURUKAWA DENCHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1, Hoshikawa 2-chome, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states FURUKAWA DENCHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1, Hoshikawa 2-chome, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakao, Shinjiro 5-8-101, Katkamori Isehara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/32] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33, Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91100064.4 | 02.01.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | JP19900021181 | 31.01.1990 Original published format: JP 2118190 | [1991/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0440015 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0440015 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440015 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/38 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
H01M4/383 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10S420/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/32] | Title | German: | Elektrode aus Wasserstoffeinlagerungslegierung | [1991/32] | English: | Hydrogen-occlusion alloy electrode | [1991/32] | French: | Electrode en alliage à occlusion d'hydrogène | [1991/32] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 25.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62184765 ; | [A]EP0161075 (OVONIC BATTERY CO [US]); | [X]FR2623271 (KHUOCHIH KONG [US], et al); | [A]EP0342654 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 26 (E-577)[2873], 26th January 1988; & JP-A-62 184 765 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO., LTD) 13-08-1987, & JP62184765 A 00000000 |