|
31.01.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.12.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Appeal |
20 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
02.04.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2003 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.03.2003 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
30.10.2002 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.10.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Appeal |
14 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2002 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2002 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2000 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.10.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.1998 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.05.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.04.1998 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.1998 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.1998 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
20 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1997 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1997 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1997 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.12.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1997 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.03.1997 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.01.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.08.1996 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.07.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1996 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.04.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1996 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.10.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1995 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.10.1995 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
27.09.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1995 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1995 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.01.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
12.01.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.01.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.01.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.01.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.02.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1993 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.12.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.10.1993 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.1993 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1993 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.1993 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.1993 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
22.04.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1991 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1991 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.1991 |
Subsequently filed documents not duly signed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |