EP0438090 - Binder composition for the preparation of pigment pastes and aqueous coating compositions containing these pigment pastes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [2004/06] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 D-42285 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patzschke, Hans-Peter, Dr. Am Heckendorn 71 W-5600 Wuppertal 2 / DE | 02 /
Goebel, Armin Osteroder Strasse 27 W-5600 Wuppertal 2 / DE | 03 /
Döbert, Jürgen Gevelsberger Strasse 149B W-4322 Sprockhövel 2 / DE | 04 /
Windmann, Reinhard Gennebreckerstrasse 41 W-5600 Wuppertal 2 / DE | [1991/30] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91100338.2 | 12.01.1991 | [1991/30] | Priority number, date | DE19904000889 | 13.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4000889 | [1991/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0438090 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438090 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0438090 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09D175/06, C09D17/00, C09D5/02, C08G18/42 | [1991/30] | CPC: |
C09D175/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/0819 (EP,US);
C08G18/6659 (EP,US);
C09D17/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D175/06, C08L2666/16 (US,EP);
C09D175/06, C08L75/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/30] | Title | German: | Bindemittelzusammensetzung zur Herstellung von Pigmentpasten und wässrige Überzugsmittel, die diese Pigmentpasten enthalten | [1991/30] | English: | Binder composition for the preparation of pigment pastes and aqueous coating compositions containing these pigment pastes | [1991/30] | French: | Composition liant pour la préparation de pâtes pigmentaires et compositions de revêtement aqueuses contenant ces pâtes pigmentaires | [1991/30] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 16.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.1995
07.02.1995
ADMISSIBLE BASF Coatings AG CT/R-B311 Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Fitzner, Ulrich Fitzner & Frese PartGmbH Rechtsanwalt - Patentanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.1995
07.02.1995
ADMISSIBLE BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstr. 1 48165 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Fitzner, Ulrich, Dr. Konrad-Adenauer-Platz 17 D-40852 Ratingen-Lintorf / DE | ||
Former [1995/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.1995
07.02.1995
ADMISSIBLE BASF Lacke und Farben AG Glasuritstr. 1 48165 Münster-Hiltrup / DE Opponent's representative Fitzner, Ulrich, Dr. Konrad-Adenauer-Platz 17 D-40852 Ratingen-Lintorf / DE | 16.02.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.10.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.04.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 01.07.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 27.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 09.12.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.01.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 10.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.07.2003 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.12.2003 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 16.03.1998 | Appeal received No. T0259/98 | 28.05.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.10.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 30.10.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.11.2002 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57178863 ; | [A]JP1113230 ; | [A]JP54143306 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL, no. 82-07 689, DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., London, GB; & JP-A-57 178 863 (FUJIKURA RUBBER WORKS KK), 04-11-1982., & JP57178863 A 00000000 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL, no. 89-170 457, DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., London, GB; & JP-A-1 113 230 (UNITIKA KK) 01-05-1989., & JP1113230 A 00000000 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, no. 79-91 577, DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., London, GB & JP-A-54 143 306 (ARAKAWA KAGAKU KOGYO) 08-11-1979., & JP54143306 A 00000000 |