EP0442269 - White balance adjusting system for a color image pickup apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takagi, Yasushi No. 307, Fujimi-Ryo, 1545 Yoshida-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 244 / JP | 02 /
Imaide, Takuya, No. 514 Hachimanyama Apt. 1545 Yoshida-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 244 / JP | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/34] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91100440.6 | 16.01.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | JP19900006194 | 17.01.1990 Original published format: JP 619490 | [1991/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0442269 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0442269 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/73 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
H04N23/88 (EP,US);
H03K21/38 (KR);
H04N9/77 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1991/34] | Title | German: | Weissabgleicheinstellungssystem für ein Farbbildaufnahmegerät | [1991/34] | English: | White balance adjusting system for a color image pickup apparatus | [1991/34] | French: | Système de réglage de l'équilibre du blanc pour un appareil de prise d'image couleur | [1991/34] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 16.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 01.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/05] | 01.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP63109686 ; | [A]EP0224904 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US4727413 (MIURA AKIMITSU [JP], et al); | [A]US4750032 (NAKAYAMA YOSHIAKI [JP]); | [AD]US4797733 (TAKAGI YASUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0322791 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [AP]US4947242 (HIEDA TERUO [JP]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 355 (E-661)22 September 1988 & JP-A-63 109 686 ( VICTOR CO OF JAPAN LTD ) 14 May 1988, & JP63109686 A 19880514 |