EP0439077 - Synthetic peptide compositions with immunoreactivities to antibodies to HTLV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Biomedical Inc. 2 Nevada Drive Lake Success New York 11042 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | For all designated states United Biomedical Inc. 2 Nevada Drive Lake Success New York 11042 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang Yi Wang 156 Hill Park Avenue Great Neck New York 11021 / US | [1991/31] | Representative(s) | Vogeser, Werner, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Vogeser, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann, Vogeser, Dr. Boecker, Alber, Dr. Strych, Liedl Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 D-81369 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/31] | Vogeser, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Hansmann Vogeser Dr. Boecker Alber Dr. Strych, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91100616.1 | 18.01.1991 | [1991/31] | Priority number, date | US19900469291 | 24.01.1990 Original published format: US 469291 | [1991/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0439077 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0439077 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0439077 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/15, G01N33/569 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C12N2740/14022 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/31] | C07K7/10, C07K7/08, G01N33/569 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/31] | Title | German: | Immunaktive Peptidzusammensetzung gegen HTLV-Antikörper | [1991/31] | English: | Synthetic peptide compositions with immunoreactivities to antibodies to HTLV | [1991/31] | French: | Composition peptidique ayant une activité immunologique contre des anticorps contre HTLV | [1991/31] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 28.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 05.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.05.2000 | FR | 17.05.2000 | IT | 17.05.2000 | NL | 17.05.2000 | SE | 17.08.2000 | DE | 18.08.2000 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
FR | 17.05.2000 | ||
NL | 17.05.2000 | ||
SE | 17.08.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
Former [2003/07] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
NL | 17.05.2000 | ||
SE | 17.08.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/13] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
SE | 17.08.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
SE | 17.08.2000 | ||
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/24] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | BE | 17.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4833071 ; | [X]WO8908664 ; | [XP]WO9010231 ; | [XP]WO9015820 | [X] - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY vol. 142, no. 3, 1989, BALTIMORE pages 971 - 978; PALKER ET AL: 'Mapping of immunogenic regions of human T cell leukemia virus type 1 ( HTLV-1 ) gp46 envelope glycoproteins with env-coded synthetic peptides and a monoclonal antibody to gp46' |