EP0439092 - Holograms with discontinuous metallization including alphanumeric shapes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.1996 [1996/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Bank Note Holographics, Inc. 500 Executive Boulevard Elmsford New York 10523 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | For all designated states AMERICAN BANK NOTE HOLOGRAPHICS, INC. 500 Executive Boulevard Elmsford New York 10523 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mallik, Donald W. 138 Harwood Avenue North Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | [1991/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91100686.4 | 21.01.1991 | [1991/31] | Priority number, date | US19900470121 | 25.01.1990 Original published format: US 470121 | [1991/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0439092 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0439092 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/02, G03H1/02, G06K19/16 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
G03H1/028 (EP,US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/45 (EP,US);
G03H2250/10 (EP,US);
G03H2250/36 (EP,US);
G03H2250/40 (EP,US);
Y10S283/904 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/31] | B42D15/02, G06K19/08, G03H1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/31] | Title | German: | Hologramme mit unterbrochener Metallisierung einschliesslich alphanumerischer Zeichen | [1991/31] | English: | Holograms with discontinuous metallization including alphanumeric shapes | [1991/31] | French: | Hologrammes à métallisation discontinue comprenant des formes alphanumériques | [1991/31] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 17.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 01.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/10] | 27.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61176968 ; | [X]JP62032486 ; | [X]JP62212682 ; | [XP]JP2081082 ; | [X]GB2136352 (HOLLUSIONS LIMITED); | [X]EP0253089 (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]); | [XE]DE4025296 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) |