EP0440090 - Suction hood for injurious gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB Ph. Nederman & Co. Sydhamnsgatan 2 252 28 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states AB Ph. Nederman & Co. Sydhamnsgatan 2 S-252 28 Helsingborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karlsson, Hakan Ronald Vävaregränd 4 S-241 30 Eslöv / SE | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl Heinz, et al Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Wagner, Karl Heinz, et al H. Wagner & Co. AB Norra Vallgatan 72 S-211 22 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 91100905.8 | 24.01.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | SE19900000322 | 31.01.1990 Original published format: SE 9000322 | [1991/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440090 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440090 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B08B15/02 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
B08B15/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/32] | Title | German: | Absaughaube für schädliche Gase | [1991/32] | English: | Suction hood for injurious gases | [1991/32] | French: | Hotte d'aspiration pour des gaz nuisibles | [1991/32] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 10.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.1995 | BE | 05.04.1995 | CH | 05.04.1995 | DK | 05.04.1995 | ES | 05.04.1995 | GR | 05.04.1995 | IT | 05.04.1995 | LI | 05.04.1995 | NL | 05.04.1995 | SE | 05.07.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 05.04.1995 | |
BE | 05.04.1995 | ||
CH | 05.04.1995 | ||
DK | 05.04.1995 | ||
ES | 05.04.1995 | ||
GR | 05.04.1995 | ||
IT | 05.04.1995 | ||
LI | 05.04.1995 | ||
SE | 05.07.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 05.04.1995 | |
BE | 05.04.1995 | ||
CH | 05.04.1995 | ||
DK | 05.04.1995 | ||
GR | 05.04.1995 | ||
IT | 05.04.1995 | ||
LI | 05.04.1995 | ||
SE | 05.07.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 05.04.1995 | |
BE | 05.04.1995 | ||
CH | 05.04.1995 | ||
DK | 05.04.1995 | ||
IT | 05.04.1995 | ||
LI | 05.04.1995 | ||
SE | 05.07.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 05.04.1995 | |
BE | 05.04.1995 | ||
CH | 05.04.1995 | ||
DK | 05.04.1995 | ||
LI | 05.04.1995 | ||
SE | 05.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 05.04.1995 | |
BE | 05.04.1995 | ||
CH | 05.04.1995 | ||
LI | 05.04.1995 | ||
SE | 05.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 05.04.1995 | |
CH | 05.04.1995 | ||
LI | 05.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/44] | CH | 05.04.1995 | |
LI | 05.04.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU916913 ; | [A]FR2334432 (BARBIERI GALDINO [FR]) | [A] - Soviet Inventions Illustrated, P section, week K 06, March 23, 1983, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, P 43; & SU-A-916 913 (GORKI CAR WKS)., & SU916913 A 00000000 |