EP0439178 - Pulse phase difference encoding circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SOKEN, INC. 14, Iwaya Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-shi Aichi-Ken / JP | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states NIPPON SOKEN, INC. 14, Iwaya Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-shi Aichi-Ken / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | |||
Former [1991/31] | For all designated states NIPPON SOKEN, INC. 14, Iwaya Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-shi Aichi-Ken / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoshino, Kouichi 3-13-11, Kyouwa Ohbu-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Takamoto 16-2, Ishiboriyama, Narumi-cho Midori-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 03 /
Ohtsuka, Yoshinori 3-34, Eguchi 2-chome Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP | [1991/31] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 91100920.7 | 24.01.1991 | [1991/31] | Priority number, date | JP19900015865 | 25.01.1990 Original published format: JP 1586590 | [1991/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0439178 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0439178 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01R25/08 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
G04F10/00 (EP,US);
G01R25/08 (EP,US);
G04F10/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/31] | Title | German: | Pulsphasendifferenz-Kodierschaltung | [1991/31] | English: | Pulse phase difference encoding circuit | [1991/31] | French: | Circuit pour coder la différence des phases d'impulsions | [1991/31] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/34: Teilanmeldung 95100701.2 eingereicht am 24/01/91 | EPB 1995/34: Divisional application 95100701.2 filed on 24/01/91 | EPB 1995/34: Demande divisionnaire 95100701.2 déposée le 24/01/91 | Examination procedure | 20.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 08.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95100701.2 / EP0650256 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1464771 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH) | Examination | EP0379180 |