EP0468128 - Drill chuck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm, Günter Horst Heinrich-Röhm-Strasse 50 D-89567 Sontheim / DE | [1992/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Fay, Hermann, et al Postfach 17 67 89007 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Fay, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Postfach 17 67 D-89007 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 91101106.2 | 29.01.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | DE19904023303 | 21.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4023303 | DE19900016578U | 06.12.1990 Original published format: DE 9016578 U | [1992/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0468128 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468128 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/12 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
B23B31/123 (EP,US);
B23B31/1238 (EP,US);
B23B2231/38 (EP,US);
B23B2231/44 (EP,US);
Y10S279/902 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17632 (EP,US);
Y10T279/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1992/05] | Title | German: | Bohrfutter | [1992/05] | English: | Drill chuck | [1992/05] | French: | Mandrin de perceuse | [1992/05] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 05.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.04.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0300375 (SAKAMAKI MFG [JP]); | [A]EP0340310 (SAKAMAKI MFG [JP]); | [A]DE3809000 (MS IND CO [JP]); | [A]EP0331866 (ROEHM GUENTER H); | [AD]EP0059030 | Examination | EP0253761 |