EP0440187 - Arrangement for converting binary input signal into corresponding in-phase and quadrature phase signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichihara, Masaki, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91101199.7 | 30.01.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | JP19900020659 | 31.01.1990 Original published format: JP 2065990 | [1991/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0440187 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0440187 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440187 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/20, H04L27/12 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
G06F1/0353 (EP,US);
H04L25/03834 (EP,US);
G06F1/0342 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/32] | H04L27/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/32] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Umwandlung eines binären Eingangssignals in entsprechende Quadratursignale | [1991/32] | English: | Arrangement for converting binary input signal into corresponding in-phase and quadrature phase signals | [1991/32] | French: | Dispositif à conversion de signaux binaires d'entrée en signaux en phase et en quadrature correspondants | [1991/32] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 09.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0169612 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) |