EP0440205 - Pressing diaphragm and pressing filter plate for a compression type filter press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/32] | Pressing diaphragm and pressing filter plate provided with pressing diaphragm of compression type filter press | ||
[1995/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURITA MACHINERY MANUFACTURING COMPANY LIMITED 1-44, Sakaigawa 2-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states KURITA MACHINERY MANUFACTURING COMPANY LIMITED 1-44, Sakaigawa 2-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kataoka, Atsushi 1, Satsukigaoka-nishi Suita-shi, Osaka / JP | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/32] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91101222.7 | 30.01.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | JP19900021526 | 30.01.1990 Original published format: JP 2152690 | JP19900053942 | 06.03.1990 Original published format: JP 5394290 | JP19900057478 | 08.03.1990 Original published format: JP 5747890 | [1991/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440205 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440205 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01D25/133 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
B01D25/127 (EP,US);
B01D25/285 (EP,US);
B01D25/386 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1991/32] | Title | German: | Pressmembran und Filterplatte für eine Kompressionsfilterpresse | [1995/29] | English: | Pressing diaphragm and pressing filter plate for a compression type filter press | [1995/29] | French: | Membrane à pression et plaque de filtre pour une filtre-presse à plaques | [1995/29] |
Former [1991/32] | Kompressionsmembrane und Kompressionsfilterplatte mit Membrane einer Filterpresse des Filtrationskompressionstyps | ||
Former [1991/32] | Pressing diaphragm and pressing filter plate provided with pressing diaphragm of compression type filter press | ||
Former [1991/32] | Membrane à pression et plateau de filtre-presse pourvu d'une membrane à pression du genre de filtre-presse | Examination procedure | 08.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 07.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2069358 (MOSELEY RUBBER CO LTD); | [A]GB2110104 (KENYON JACK); | [A]US4237009 (KURITA TETSUYA); | [A]GB1583198 (KURITA MACHINERY MANUF) |