EP0447772 - Bandsaw guide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEINZ NIENSTEDT MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH Recklinghäuser Strasse 90-92 D-45721 Haltern / DE | [1991/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenberger, Jörg Zum Dachsberg 15 W-4358 Haltern-Flaesheim / DE | 02 /
Book, Franz Heinrich-Rumpf-Strasse 23 W-4358 Haltern / DE | [1991/39] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91101403.3 | 02.02.1991 | [1991/39] | Priority number, date | DE19904009405 | 23.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4009405 | [1991/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0447772 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0447772 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23D55/08, B23Q11/02 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
B23D55/082 (EP,US);
B23Q11/02 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2209 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7264 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, GB, SE [1991/39] | Title | German: | Sägebandführung | [1991/39] | English: | Bandsaw guide | [1991/39] | French: | Guide de scie à ruban | [1991/39] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 17.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1870774 (GAINES EUGENE F); | [A]US2741281 (BRAUN HERBERT D); | [A]US3280862 (FOLEY JOSEPH J); | [A]US3530752 (WASHIO KANICHI, et al); | [A]US3689168 (PERSSON HENRY); | [AD]DE8228862U ; | [A]DE3241471 (FALKENSTEIN JOHANNES); | [A]EP0155328 (FRISCO FINDUS AG [CH]); | [A]US4648301 (SCOTT PAUL C [US]); | [A]FR2622832 (VALENTIN BERNARD [FR]) |