EP0451458 - Polymer mixture which comprises polyphenylene ether, polyoctenylene and TiO2 or BaSO4 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.09.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1991/42] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, N.Y. 12151 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bailly, Christian Maria Emile General Electric Plastics B.V., P.O. Box 117 NL-4600 AC Bergen op Zoom / NL | 02 /
Hoeks, Theodorus Lambertus General Electric Plastics B.V., P.O. Box 117 NL-4600 AC Bergen op Zoom / NL | 03 /
Lohmeijer, Johannes Hubertus Gabriel Marie General Electric Plastics B.V., P.O. Box 117 NL-4600 AC Bergen op Zoom / NL | 04 /
Roovers, Wilhelmus Marinus Maria General Electric Plastics B.V., P.O. Box 117 NL-4600 AC Bergen op Zoom / NL | [1991/42] | Representative(s) | Grever, Frederik, et al General Electric Plastics B.V. P.O. Box 117 4600 AC Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | Grever, Frederik, et al General Electric Plastics B.V. P.O. Box 117 NL-4600 AC Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [1994/51] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1991/42] | Schüler, Horst, Dr. General Electric Praunheimer Landstrasse 50 D-6000 Frankfurt 90 / DE | Application number, filing date | 91101914.9 | 12.02.1991 | [1991/42] | Priority number, date | NL19900000837 | 10.04.1990 Original published format: NL 9000837 | [1991/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0451458 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0451458 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/12, C08K3/22, C08K3/30, C08L65/00 | [1991/42] | CPC: |
C08K3/18 (EP,US);
C08L65/00 (EP,US);
C08L71/123 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/18, C08L65/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/18, C08L71/12 (US,EP);
C08L65/00, C08L2666/22 (US,EP);
C08L71/123, C08L2666/22 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/42] | Title | German: | Polyphenylenäther, Polyoctenylen und TiO2 oder BaSO4 enthaltende Polymerzusammensetzung | [1991/42] | English: | Polymer mixture which comprises polyphenylene ether, polyoctenylene and TiO2 or BaSO4 | [1991/42] | French: | Mélange de polymères contenant un poly(éther de phénylène), un polyocténylène et TiO2 ou BaSO4 | [1991/42] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 28.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.09.1995
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung/PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | [1995/47] | 02.11.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.02.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.03.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M03) | 21.06.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.12.1997 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 21.12.1994 | IT | 21.12.1994 | NL | 21.12.1994 | GB | 21.03.1995 | ES | 22.03.1995 | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/35] | FR | 21.12.1994 | |
IT | 21.12.1994 | ||
NL | 21.12.1994 | ||
GB | 21.03.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 21.12.1994 | |
NL | 21.12.1994 | ||
GB | 21.03.1995 | ||
FR | 19.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/15] | NL | 21.12.1994 | |
GB | 21.03.1995 | ||
FR | 19.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | NL | 21.12.1994 | |
FR | 19.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | FR | 19.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3518277 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0185860 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0205816 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) |