EP0447796 - Hydraulic circuit brake system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.1995 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/39] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernhardt, Wolfgang, Ing. Tubizerstrasse 21 W-7015 Korntal / DE | 02 /
Kirstein, Lothar, Dipl.-Ing. Leiterweg 51 W-7257 Ditzingen / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., Dr. Backnanger Weg 13 W-7146 Tamm-Hohenstange / DE | 04 /
Wetzel, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Auguste-Supper-Weg 12 W-7015 Korntal 1 / DE | 05 /
Holzmann, Roland, Dipl.-Ing. Klopstockstrasse 36 W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [1991/39] | Application number, filing date | 91102071.7 | 14.02.1991 | [1991/39] | Priority number, date | DE19904032784 | 16.10.1990 Original published format: DE 4032784 | DE19904009302 | 23.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4009302 | [1991/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0447796 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0447796 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/32 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
B60T8/4872 (EP,US);
B60T8/4031 (EP,US);
B60T8/4275 (EP,US);
B60T8/4881 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/39] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Zweikreisbremsanlage | [1991/39] | English: | Hydraulic circuit brake system | [1991/39] | French: | Système à freinage hydraulique à double circuit | [1991/39] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 31.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3900852 ; | [YP]FR2636575 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]GB2119883 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]US4874208 (SIEGEL HEINZ [DE]) |