EP0443441 - Fence [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adronit Verwaltungs GmbH. & Co. GbR mbH. Oberwengerner Str. 204 D-58300 Wetter / DE | [1993/51] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states ADRONIT-WERK, HERMANN ADERHOLD GmbH & Co. Oberwengerner Strasse 204 D-58300 Wetter / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmelzer, Karl Genossenschaftsweg 52 W-5800 Hagen / DE | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135 D-58097 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102085.7 | 14.02.1991 | [1991/35] | Priority number, date | DE19904005160 | 17.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4005160 | [1991/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0443441 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0443441 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E04H17/16 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
E04H17/168 (EP,US);
E04H17/1417 (EP);
E04H17/1447 (EP);
E04H17/1456 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/35] | Title | German: | Gitterzaun | [1991/35] | English: | Fence | [1991/35] | French: | Grillage | [1991/35] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/39] | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 09.03.1994 | [2000/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL273313 ; | [A]US3848382 (RENSCH E); | [A]GB1453974 (LB PLASTICS LTD); | [A]EP0288703 (HOESCH AG [DE], et al); | [A]FR2620754 (CONST PREFABRIQ MONTLIMA [FR]) |