EP0442504 - Ferroelectric liquid crystal device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-Cho Abeno-Ku Osaka 545-0013 / JP | For all designated states Daiso Co., Ltd. 10-8, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states Daiso Co., Ltd. 10-8, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koden, Mitsuhiro Suzaku dai-ichi Jutaku 30-503, 5-2-1, Suzaku Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Kuratate, Tomoaki 3-18-11, Torimi-cho Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Funada, Fumiaki 33-10, Izumihara-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Sakaguchi, Kazuhiko 2-7-1-211, Minamisakurazuka Toyonaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Shiomi, Yutaka 2-81 Motohama-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 06 /
Kitamura, Tohru 7-441-1, Shinmachi, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102112.9 | 14.02.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | JP19900037053 | 15.02.1990 Original published format: JP 3705390 | [1991/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0442504 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0442504 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0442504 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/34, C09K19/42, C09K19/46, G02F1/1337 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
C09K19/0225 (EP);
C09K19/34 (KR);
C09K19/42 (EP);
C09K19/46 (EP);
C09K19/3405 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/34] | Title | German: | Ferroelektrische Flüssigkristallvorrichtung | [1991/34] | English: | Ferroelectric liquid crystal device | [1991/34] | French: | Dispositif à cristal liquide ferroélectrique | [1991/34] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 20.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.05.1995 | NL | 03.05.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | NL | 03.05.1995 | |
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | FR | 29.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0421438 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [YP]EP0410447 (DAISO CO LTD [JP]); | [YP]EP0388141 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [YP]EP0384432 (DAISO CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]GB2216540 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) |