EP0445559 - Self-closing door hinge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.1992 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KERMI GmbH Pankofen-Bahnhof 1 94447 Plattling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states KERMI GmbH Pankofen-Bahnhof 1 D-94447 Plattling / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merz, Günter Dr. Kollmann-Strasse 27 W-8360 Deggendorf / DE | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Kaiser, Henning Preussag AG Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 61 02 09 D-30602 Hannover / DE | [1991/37] | Application number, filing date | 91102141.8 | 15.02.1991 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | DE19900002749U | 06.03.1990 Original published format: DE 9002749 U | [1991/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445559 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E05D11/10, E05F1/06 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
E05F1/1223 (EP);
E05D11/1078 (EP);
E05F1/061 (EP);
E05Y2201/638 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1991/37] | Title | German: | Selbstschliessendes Türscharnier | [1991/37] | English: | Self-closing door hinge | [1991/37] | French: | Charnière pour portes à retour automatique | [1991/37] | File destroyed: | 16.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 12.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/49] | 10.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2920339 ; | [Y]FR1340744 ; | [A]EP0266490 ; | [A]EP0124838 ; | [A]FR2439286 ; | [A]EP0100384 |