EP0443482 - Arrangement for linking digital terminals to a single, higher speed port [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS 12, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | [1991/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allouis, Jacques 1, rue Octave Landwerlin F-67540 Ostwald / FR | 02 /
Medlicott, Mark 4, rue Victor-Hugo F-67400 Illkirch / FR | 03 /
Penet, Xavier 77, rue des Charmilles F-67400 Illkirch Graffenstaden / FR | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102263.0 | 18.02.1991 | [1991/35] | Priority number, date | FR19900002123 | 21.02.1990 Original published format: FR 9002123 | [1991/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0443482 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/24, H04L5/14 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
H04L5/1492 (EP);
H04L5/24 (EP);
H04Q11/0471 (EP);
H04Q2213/031 (EP);
H04Q2213/034 (EP);
H04Q2213/197 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/35] | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Anschluss digitaler Endstationen an eine einzige Schnittstelle höherer Geschwindigkeit | [1991/35] | English: | Arrangement for linking digital terminals to a single, higher speed port | [1991/35] | French: | Agencement de raccordement de terminaux numériques à un même port ayant un débit supérieur | [1991/35] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 31.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/11] | 01.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60178747 ; | [A]EP0292686 ; | [A]US3866175 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 16 (E-375)(2073) 22 janvier 1986, & JP-A-60 178747 (MEIDENSHA K. K.) 12 septembre 1985,, & JP60178747 A 00000000 |