EP0443498 - Optically active 8-methoxyquinolonecarb-oxylic acid derivatives, their preparative processes and their intermediates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 5, Kanda Surugadai 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states KYORIN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. No. 5, Kanda Surugadai 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asahina, Yoshikazu No. 5982-1, Tomonuma, Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP | 02 /
Fukuda, Yasumichi No. 6096 Tomonuma, Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP | 03 /
Fukuda, Hideyuki No. 387, Touya-machi Utsunomiya-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | ter Meer, Nicolaus Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | ter Meer, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Chem., Dr. Patentanwälte TER MEER-MÜLLER-STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102291.1 | 18.02.1991 | [1991/35] | Priority number, date | JP19900037819 | 19.02.1990 Original published format: JP 3781990 | [1991/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0443498 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D207/10, C07D207/12, C07D207/14, C07D309/12, C07C31/34, C07C271/16, C07C309/42, A61K31/47 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,KR);
A61K31/47 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07C271/16 (EP);
C07C31/36 (EP);
C07D207/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/35] | Title | German: | Optisch aktive Derivate von 8-Methoxychinolinoncarbonsäuren, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Zwischenprodukte | [1991/35] | English: | Optically active 8-methoxyquinolonecarb-oxylic acid derivatives, their preparative processes and their intermediates | [1991/35] | French: | Dérivés optiquement actifs des acides 8-méthoxyquinolinone-carboxyliques, procédés pour leur préparation et composés intermédiaires | [1991/35] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 11.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/31] | 11.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60104061 ; | [YD]EP0230295 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]); | [Y]EP0302371 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [Y]EP0347851 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]); | [X]EP0341493 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO [JP]); | [A]GB2013662 (ILE DE FRANCE); | [A]EP0218249 (TOKYO KASEI KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 14, no. 1, 1971, pages 24 - 30; D.T. WITIAK et al.: "L[S]- and D[R]-3-Amino-1-phenylpyrrolidines. Stereoselective Antagonists for Histamine and Acetylcholine Receptors in Vitro" * page 25,compound 1; page 29,last paragraph to page 30,first paragraph | [X] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 30, no. 48, 1989, pages 6721 - 6724; H. TOSHIMA et al.: "Synthetic study on aplysiatoxins, highly inflammatory agents and tumor promoters,Synthesis of the three optically active segments" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 247 (C-307)(1970) 03 October 1985, & JP-A-60 104061 (SANKYO K.K.) 08 June 1985,, & JP60104061 A 19850608 |