EP0445571 - Shower partition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.1993 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | Correction of patent application | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joh. Sprinz GmbH & Co. Goethestrasse 36 D-88214 Ravensburg / DE | [1991/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scholpp, Werner Rieter Strasse 12 W-7143 Vaihingen 2 / DE | 02 /
Kuimets, Uwe Wilhelmstrasse 17 W-7125 Kirchheim / DE | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102328.1 | 19.02.1991 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | DE19904006936 | 06.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4006936 | [1991/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0445571 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0445571 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/11] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0445571 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/22 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
A47K3/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/37] | Title | German: | Duschabtrennung | [1991/37] | English: | Shower partition | [1991/37] | French: | Cloison pour douche | [1991/37] | File destroyed: | 03.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/24] | 13.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.10.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE848316 (POTTHOFF ADOLF); | [X]FR2046108 (SAINT GOBAIN); | [Y]DE2059829 (GARCIA MARTINEZ EDUARDO, et al); | [X]FR2601868 (SERVAUX PIERRE [FR]); | [A]EP0279337 (BAUS HEINZ GEORG) |