EP0443540 - Hindered phenolic N-(amido)-imides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-3222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-3222 / US | ||
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. Three Parkway Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wicher, Jerome 353 Woodward Drive West Seneca, New York 14221 / US | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102405.7 | 20.02.1991 | [1991/35] | Priority number, date | US19900481940 | 20.02.1990 Original published format: US 481940 | [1991/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0443540 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/50, C07D209/48, C07D209/76, C08K5/3415, C08K5/3417 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP,US);
C07D207/50 (EP,US);
C07D209/76 (EP,US);
C08K5/3412 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/35] | Title | German: | Sterisch gehinderte phenolische N-(Amido)imide | [1991/35] | English: | Hindered phenolic N-(amido)-imides | [1991/35] | French: | N-(Amido)imides phénoliques à empêchement stérique | [1991/35] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 06.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/37] | 12.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3500058 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]US4687797 (HANSEN RALPH H [US]); | [A]DE2438406 (UBE INDUSTRIES) |