EP0435852 - Disk format for secondary storage system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [1991/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rubinson, Barry L. 5 Sandy Drive Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US | 02 /
Parenti, Mark A. 2 Arrawana Street Colorado Springs, CO 80909 / US | 03 /
Lary, Richard F. 1650 Summit Point Court Colorado Springs CO 80919 / US | 04 /
Gardner, Edward A. 1262 Hofstead Terrace Colorado Springs, CO 80907 / US | [1992/04] |
Former [1991/48] | 01 /
Rubinson, Barry L. 5 Sandy Drive Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US | ||
02 /
Parenti, Mark A. 2 Arrawana Street Colorado Springs, CO 80909 / US | |||
03 /
Lary, Richard F. 114 Big Valley Drive Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US | |||
04 /
Gardner, Edward A. 1262 Hofstead Terrace Colorado Springs, CO 80907 / US | |||
Former [1991/27] | 01 /
Rubinson, Barry L. 585 Anaconda Drive Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US | ||
02 /
Parenti, Mark A. 2 Arrawana Street Colorado Springs, CO 80909 / US | |||
03 /
Lary, Richard F. 114 Big Valley Drive Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US | |||
04 /
Gardner, Edward A. 1262 Hofstead Terrace Colorado Springs, CO 80907 / US | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102423.0 | 04.10.1982 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | US19810308771 | 05.10.1981 Original published format: US 308771 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0435852 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0435852 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/18, G11B20/12 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
G11B20/1883 (EP);
G11B20/1252 (EP);
G11B20/1803 (EP);
G11B2220/20 (EP);
G11B2220/2508 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/27] | Title | German: | Plattenformat für sekundäres Speichersystem | [1991/27] | English: | Disk format for secondary storage system | [1991/27] | French: | Format de disque pour un système de stockage secondaire | [1991/27] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 06.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/30] | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP82903413.1 / EP0090040 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1991 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3771143 ; | [A]FR2426938 ; | [A]US4152695 ; | [A]US3689891 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 17, no. 6, November 1974, NEW YORK US pages 1738 - 1739; T.ADAMS ET AL: 'ALTERNATE SECTOR ASSIGNMENT' |