EP0450299 - Filtering element with folded material in ring or flat disposition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNECHT Filterwerke GmbH Pragstrasse 54 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH Pragstrasse 54 D-70376 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waibel, Hans Bachstelzenstrasse 20a W-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE | 02 /
Schneider, Horst Bangertstrasse 50 W-7050 Waiblingen 8 / DE | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Pfusch, Volker MAHLE GMBH, Patentabteilung 70369 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | Pfusch, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. MAHLE GMBH, Patentabteilung D-70369 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102576.5 | 22.02.1991 | [1991/41] | Priority number, date | DE19904010732 | 03.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4010732 | [1991/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0450299 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0450299 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/52, B01D39/16 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
B01D46/10 (EP);
B01D46/521 (EP);
B01D2265/04 (EP);
B01D2271/027 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/41] | B01D46/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1991/41] | Title | German: | Filterelement aus einem zick-zack-förmig gefalteten ring- oder plattenförmig angeordneten Filterbahnmaterial | [1991/41] | English: | Filtering element with folded material in ring or flat disposition | [1991/41] | French: | Elément filtrant avec matériau plissé disposé en forme annulaire ou plat | [1991/41] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 08.09.1992 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 10.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2251347 (EQUIP AUTOMOBILE CFEA [FR]); | [A]GB1570385 (CROSLAND FILTERS LTD); | [A]DE2620148 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD); | [A]FR2075771 (GRACE W R LTD); | [A]BE536408 | Examination | EP0187358 |