EP0447834 - Supporting device for cables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONE Aktiengesellschaft Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | For all designated states KRONE Aktiengesellschaft Beeskowdamm 3-11 D-14167 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hegner, Gunter Moränenweg 22 W-1000 Berlin 27 / DE | 02 /
Delakowitz, Bernd Rebenweg 2 W-1000 Berlin 20 / DE | [1991/39] | Application number, filing date | 91102642.5 | 22.02.1991 | [1991/39] | Priority number, date | DE19904009297 | 20.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4009297 | [1991/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0447834 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0447834 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0447834 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/22 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
F16L3/227 (EP);
H02G3/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/39] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befestigung von Kabeln | [1991/39] | English: | Supporting device for cables | [1991/39] | French: | Support de fixation de câbles | [1991/39] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 22.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2505628 (ITW FASTEX ITALIA SPA); | [X]NL7507979 (RESEARCHCENTRUM OGEMAT); | [A]US4395009 (BORMKE ODO S) |