EP0444590 - Metal vapor discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | Revocation of patent | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USHIO DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA Asahi-Tokai Building 19-Floor No. 6-1, Ote-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100 / JP | [1991/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohyama, Masachika 1-15-20, Johokushinmachi Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Fuse, Tetsuo 2-13-6, Koseicho Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | 03 /
Yamaguchi, Akiyasu 602 Keiunjimaecho, Nozato Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102794.4 | 26.02.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | JP19900044415 | 27.02.1990 Original published format: JP 4441590 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444590 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444590 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/18 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
H01J61/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1991/36] | Title | German: | Metalldampfentladungslampe | [1991/36] | English: | Metal vapor discharge lamp | [1991/36] | French: | Lampe à vapeur de décharge métallique | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 25.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.08.1995
10.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Heraeus Noblelight GmbH Heraeusstr. 12-14 D-63450 Hanau / DE Opponent's representative Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.08.1995
10.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Heraeus Noblelight GmbH Heraeusstr. 12-14 D-63450 Hanau / DE Opponent's representative Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Stabsstelle Schutzrechte, Heraeusstrasse 12-14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | 11.09.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.01.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.10.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.10.1997 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/14] | 11.11.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4745335 ; | [A]US4074164 |