EP0444627 - Aircraft fuselage structure and method of fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamamoto, Kenju, c/o Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo-To / JP | 02 /
Amaoka, Kazuaki, c/o Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo-To / JP | 03 /
Takizawa, Naoya 2-8-14, Nishikawada-Hon-Machi Utsunomiya-Shi, Tochigi-Ken / JP | 04 /
Hosoi, Masanori 2738-1, Ooaza Fujii, Mibu-Machi Shimotsuga-Gun, Tochigi-Ken / JP | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Reichel, Wolfgang, et al 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | Reichel, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13 D-60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102878.5 | 27.02.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | JP19900048132 | 28.02.1990 Original published format: JP 4813290 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444627 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444627 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/00, B29C53/80, B29D23/22 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
B64C1/12 (EP,US);
B29C53/805 (EP,US);
B29D23/001 (EP,US);
B64C1/064 (EP,US);
B64C1/068 (EP,US);
Y02T50/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/36] | Title | German: | Struktur und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Flugzeugrumpfs | [1991/36] | English: | Aircraft fuselage structure and method of fabricating the same | [1991/36] | French: | Structure et méthode de fabrication de fuselage d'avion | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 11.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE282030 ; | [A]DE1921798 (DORNIER AG); | [A]CA1167676 (CANADA MAJESTY IN RIGHT OF) |