EP0444628 - Method of automatic control of growing neck portion of a single crystal by the CZ method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.1995 [1995/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED 4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED 4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baba, Masahiko A-5-3, Kohu Apartment Bldg 791-4, Yanase, Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-01 / JP | 02 /
Ohtsuna, Hiroshi 1-8-19, Kamiuzue-cho, Sabae-shi Hukui 916 / JP | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102879.3 | 27.02.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | JP19900048934 | 28.02.1990 Original published format: JP 4893490 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444628 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444628 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C30B15/22 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
C30B15/22 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Steuerung der Züchtung des Halsteiles eines Einkristalles nach dem Czochralski-Verfahren | [1991/36] | English: | Method of automatic control of growing neck portion of a single crystal by the CZ method | [1991/36] | French: | Procédé de croissance automatique de la partie col d'un lingot monocristallin par la méthode Czochralski | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60176989 ; | [X]US3958129 (CLEMENT DONALD R, et al); | [X]FR2071788 (IBM); | [A]DE1519850 (PHILIPS NV) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 23 (C-325)[2080], 29th January 1986; & JP-A-60 176 989 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 11-09-1985, & JP60176989 A 00000000 | [A] - SOLID-STATE TECHNOLOGY, vol. 25, no. 5, May 1982, pages 89-90, Port Washington, New York, US; "Silicon crystal growth furnace" |