07.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
10.07.2004 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
28.12.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
03.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
20.04.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] |
10.11.2000 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
27.10.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
14.04.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] |
15.10.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.12.1999 [1999/48] |
09.07.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] |
25.06.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] |
23.10.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] |
24.07.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.04.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.04.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.04.1998 |
Change - name/address |
published on 17.06.1998 [1998/25] |
01.04.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.03.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.11.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.04.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.03.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.01.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.04.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.03.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.01.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.04.1995 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] |
02.11.1994 |
First examination report |
|
11.03.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.04.1993 [1993/17] |
17.07.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] |