Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH05507295 | Global Dossier | 21.10.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9200400 | 26.02.1992 | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU650954B | Global Dossier | 07.07.1994 | B2 | AU1278392 | 06.10.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9200400 | 26.02.1992 | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9204779 | 17.08.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9200400 | 26.02.1992 | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ280952 | 15.05.1996 | B6 | CZ322092 | 17.02.1993 | A3 | Priority number | Date | EP9200400 | 26.02.1992 | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI924850 | 26.10.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9200400 | 26.02.1992 | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO924076L | 21.12.1992 | L | NO924076D0 | 21.10.1992 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP9200400 | 26.02.1992 | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL167915B | 30.12.1995 | B1 | PL296625 | 09.08.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9200400 | 26.02.1992 | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RO111369 | 30.09.1996 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP9200400 | 26.02.1992 | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2098424 | 10.12.1997 | C1 | Priority number | Date | EP9200400 | 26.02.1992 | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5432159 | 11.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9200400 | 26.02.1992 | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9215608 | Global Dossier | 17.09.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0500989 | Global Dossier | 09.12.1998 | B1 | EP0500989 | 02.09.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE174343T | 15.12.1998 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2081471 | 28.08.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69130605T | 20.05.1999 | T2 | DE69130605D1 | 21.01.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2037613 | 16.03.1994 | B1 | ES2037613 | 16.06.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUT62313 | 28.04.1993 | A | HU9203324D0 | 28.01.1993 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT100148 | 30.06.1999 | B | PT100148 | 31.05.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | EP91102950 | 27.02.1991 |