Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3248921B | Global Dossier | 21.01.2002 | B2 | JPH04211353 | 03.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4009657 | 26.03.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0448977 | Global Dossier | 17.01.1996 | B1 | EP0448977 | 13.01.1993 | A3 | EP0448977 | 02.10.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE4009657 | 26.03.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE133039T | 15.02.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4009657 | 26.03.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4009657 | 07.04.1994 | C2 | DE4009657 | 02.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4009657 | 26.03.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59107263D1 | 29.02.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4009657 | 26.03.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0448977T | 28.05.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4009657 | 26.03.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2084050T | 01.05.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4009657 | 26.03.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3018950T | 31.05.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4009657 | 26.03.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5201328 | 13.04.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4009657 | 26.03.1990 |